U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cv-05066
  • Case Name: Milbank Insurance Company v. Rushmore Photo & Gifts, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2019
  • September 06, 2019: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • September 04, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 07, 2019: [Discovery Report]
January, 2019
  • January 25, 2019: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • January 04, 2019: [Answer to Counterclaim]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 15, 2018: [Proposed Order]
  • October 15, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 25, 2018: [Counterclaim]
  • September 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 09, 2017: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Reply]
  • October 11, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 10, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 10, 2017: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 20, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • September 19, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 18, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 18, 2017: [Dismiss]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • August 22, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 22, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 22, 2017: [Supplement]
  • August 22, 2017: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.