U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50128-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ashley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 11, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 11, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 08, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 04, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 23, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 23, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 29, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 05, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 02, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 02, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 02, 2018: [Consent]
  • November 02, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 19, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 19, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 19, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 13, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 14, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 01, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 01, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 18, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 12, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
August, 2017
  • August 29, 2017: [Request]
  • August 29, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 28, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 25, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 25, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 25, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 25, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 25, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 25, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 25, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • August 25, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 25, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • August 24, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 24, 2017: [Arrest]
  • August 23, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 23, 2017: [Indictment]
  • August 23, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.