U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50127-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Carney
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Response]
  • December 09, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • November 14, 2022: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 22, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • July 19, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 15, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 15, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 15, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • July 15, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 10, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 10, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 17, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
March, 2019
  • March 22, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • March 22, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 22, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 22, 2019: [Consent]
  • March 22, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 20, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
February, 2019
  • February 15, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 14, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 14, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 14, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 14, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 30, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 04, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 08, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 27, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 20, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 18, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 11, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 23, 2017: [Text Order]
  • August 23, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 23, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.