U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50124-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Briseno
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 29, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 28, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • January 18, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 18, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 18, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 03, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 03, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 28, 2018: [Amended Plea Agreement]
  • September 28, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 28, 2018: [Consent]
  • September 28, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 21, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 21, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • September 20, 2018: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 20, 2018: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 20, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 06, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 20, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 10, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • August 10, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • August 10, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 10, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 09, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 09, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 09, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 14, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 08, 2018: [In Limine]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Notice]
  • May 15, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 10, 2018: [Notice]
  • May 03, 2018: [Notice]
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 24, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 17, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 19, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 09, 2017: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • September 18, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 18, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • September 15, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • September 12, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • September 08, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 07, 2017: [Request]
  • September 07, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 06, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 06, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 06, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 06, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 06, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 06, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 06, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • September 06, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 05, 2017: [Arrest]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 23, 2017: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • August 23, 2017: [Indictment]
  • August 23, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.