U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50123-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pinela-Talks
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 24, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 23, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • January 22, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 16, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 16, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 16, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 12, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 13, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 13, 2017: [Consent]
  • October 13, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 03, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 29, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 29, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 29, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Text Order]
  • August 23, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 23, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.