U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50122-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Loveday
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • December 03, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 13, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 29, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 22, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 12, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • May 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 15, 2018: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • May 08, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • May 08, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • May 08, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • May 08, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 04, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • May 03, 2018: [Summons Issued]
  • May 03, 2018: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Warrant]
  • May 02, 2018: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • May 02, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 22, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 26, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 06, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 21, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 27, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 24, 2017: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 24, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 23, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 23, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • October 23, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • October 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 03, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • August 23, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 23, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • August 23, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 23, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 23, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 23, 2017: [Indictment]
  • August 22, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.