U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50126-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Slim
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Letter Re Writ of Certiorari]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • June 15, 2022: [USCA Order]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • May 17, 2022: [USCA Opinion]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • September 14, 2021: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • September 10, 2021: [Transcript - Public]
  • September 10, 2021: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • September 10, 2021: [Transcript]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
  • August 19, 2021: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • August 02, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 15, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 08, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • July 08, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 02, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 01, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 01, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 01, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 01, 2021: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 10, 2021: [Sealed Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • March 10, 2021: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • March 10, 2021: [Verdict]
  • March 10, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • March 10, 2021: [Court Trial - Completed]
  • March 09, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • March 09, 2021: [Court Trial - Began]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 04, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • March 03, 2021: [Order]
February, 2021
  • February 24, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • February 24, 2021: [Waiver]
  • February 18, 2021: [Consent]
  • February 05, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 05, 2021: [In Limine]
  • February 04, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • July 23, 2020: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • July 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 17, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 07, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • July 07, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
June, 2020
  • June 10, 2020: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 22, 2020: [Extend]
  • April 15, 2020: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 10, 2020: [Dismiss Count]
  • April 03, 2020: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 06, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 06, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 06, 2020: [Continue]
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 26, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 25, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Response]
  • August 19, 2019: [Extend]
  • August 12, 2019: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 15, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
May, 2019
  • May 06, 2019: [Supplement]
  • May 03, 2019: [Extend]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Supplement]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Extend]
  • March 15, 2019: [Transcript]
  • March 06, 2019: [Oral Order]
February, 2019
  • February 04, 2019: [Exhibit List]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • January 17, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 02, 2019: [Extend]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Extend]
  • December 24, 2018: [Suppress]
  • December 17, 2018: [Declaration]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • December 11, 2018: [Suppress]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Request]
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 04, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 22, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • August 21, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • August 21, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • August 15, 2018: [Order]
  • August 14, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • August 03, 2018: [Notice]
  • August 03, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 03, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 03, 2018: [In Limine]
  • August 03, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 22, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 18, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 08, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 16, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 23, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 18, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 02, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 01, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 01, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 01, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 01, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • August 25, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 23, 2017: [Text Order]
  • August 23, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 23, 2017: [Indictment]
  • August 22, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.