U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50135-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Plumman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • March 12, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 09, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 07, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • March 02, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 27, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 27, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 13, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 05, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Extend]
  • January 24, 2018: [Notice]
  • January 24, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 03, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 17, 2017: [Consent]
  • November 17, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 09, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 09, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 09, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 13, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • September 01, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 01, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 01, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 01, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 01, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 01, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 30, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • August 30, 2017: [Arrest]
  • August 24, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • August 23, 2017: [Indictment]
  • August 23, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 23, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.