U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-40395
  • Case Name: Christy Carleen Schaack
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 04, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Closing Case]
December, 2017
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Discharging Debtor(s)]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certification of Financial Management Course]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • October 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • October 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Change of Address (Debtor Only) (Text Entry)]
  • September 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 23, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Add Trustee]
  • August 23, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • August 23, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employee Income Records]
  • August 23, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 23, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • August 23, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 23, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.