U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-40396
  • Case Name: Michael Ray Perry, Sr. and Rebecca Lynn Perry
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 29, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Certified Copy]
  • November 28, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • September 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
August, 2017
  • August 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.