U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-01005
  • Case Name: Legendary Leasing, Inc. et al v. Peiker
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
  • May 16, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • May 16, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Dismissing Adversary Proceeding]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 23, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Response to Request for Admissions/Production of Documents]
  • April 23, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Interrogatory Answers]
  • April 04, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Reschedule (pre-trial/trial)]
March, 2018
  • March 16, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 16, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Request for Admissions]
  • March 16, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Request for Production of Documents]
  • March 16, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Interrogatories]
  • March 15, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Request for Admissions]
  • March 15, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Request for Production of Documents]
  • March 15, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Interrogatories]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • January 08, 2018: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Scheduling Order (pre-trial/trial)]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Scheduling Order (pre-trial/trial)]
  • September 19, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • August 25, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Statement of Corporate Ownership]
  • August 25, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • August 24, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 24, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.