U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:07-cr-50101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Little Thunder
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 21, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 06, 2018: [Competency Report]
  • December 03, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 30, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 22, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order for Psychiatric Examination]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 19, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 19, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 18, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: [Order on Petition to Revoke]
  • May 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • May 11, 2018: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
March, 2018
  • March 01, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Continue]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 09, 2017: [Continue]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 26, 2017: [Continue]
  • September 11, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 11, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 08, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 01, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 01, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 28, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 28, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • August 25, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 25, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.