U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Quiver et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • January 21, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 21, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 12, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 20, 2021: [Furlough]
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 16, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 16, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 14, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 14, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 14, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 31, 2020: [Consent]
  • December 31, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 29, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 28, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 11, 2020: [Consent]
  • December 11, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 11, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 11, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • December 09, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 09, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 22, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 20, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 15, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 15, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 25, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • September 24, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 23, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 20, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 20, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 20, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 20, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 20, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 20, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 19, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • May 03, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 03, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • April 24, 2018: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • April 23, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 23, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 23, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 23, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 23, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • April 17, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 17, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 17, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • April 10, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 10, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 10, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • March 27, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • March 13, 2018: [Letter(s) of Support]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 23, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 08, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 08, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 06, 2017: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 01, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 01, 2017: [Consent]
  • December 01, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 28, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 28, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 28, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 28, 2017: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • November 22, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 20, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 20, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 20, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 20, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 13, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • November 02, 2017: [Furlough]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 27, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 27, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 18, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 18, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 18, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • September 14, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 14, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 28, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 28, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 28, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 28, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 28, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 28, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • August 28, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 28, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 28, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • August 28, 2017: [Notice]
  • August 28, 2017: [Request]
  • August 28, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 25, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 25, 2017: [Arrest]
  • August 25, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.