U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50134-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Yellow Eagle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Continue]
September, 2020
  • September 08, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2020
  • August 17, 2020: [USCA Judgment]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • July 31, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • July 31, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • July 21, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • July 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 16, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • July 16, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • July 15, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 02, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Redacted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • June 22, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 19, 2020: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 19, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 18, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • June 17, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 16, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 16, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 16, 2020: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • June 15, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • June 15, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • June 15, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 04, 2020: [Consent]
  • June 02, 2020: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • June 02, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 02, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 28, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 28, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 10, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • February 27, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 27, 2020: [Extend]
  • February 21, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 18, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 18, 2019: [Consent]
  • December 18, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 17, 2019: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 16, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 16, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 16, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • December 05, 2019: [Jury List]
  • December 05, 2019: [Request]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2019
  • June 21, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 18, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 18, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 13, 2019: [Request]
April, 2019
  • April 26, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 23, 2019: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 22, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 16, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • April 09, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Request]
  • March 21, 2019: [Response]
  • March 20, 2019: [Response]
  • March 18, 2019: [Bill of Particulars]
  • March 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 18, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 15, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • March 12, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 05, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 01, 2019: [Objection]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Order]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 09, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • November 14, 2018: [Response]
  • November 14, 2018: [Furlough]
October, 2018
  • October 09, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 04, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 01, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 01, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 01, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 08, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 03, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • November 02, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 26, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 24, 2017: [Order]
  • October 17, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 16, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 02, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 02, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 22, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 06, 2017: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • September 06, 2017: [Request]
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 01, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 01, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 01, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 01, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 28, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 28, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • August 28, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 28, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • August 28, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 25, 2017: [Arrest]
  • August 25, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.