U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-40400
  • Case Name: Robert Wayne Ruf and Chieko (NMN) Ruf
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (text order)]
  • August 25, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • June 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • June 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismissing Case (text order) Ch 12/13]
  • June 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • June 18, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • June 12, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
May, 2019
  • May 25, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 23, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • May 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • May 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
December, 2018
  • December 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • December 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
March, 2018
  • March 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • March 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing]
  • March 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 28, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • October 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • October 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - No Hrng (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • October 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • October 04, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • October 04, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
September, 2017
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • August 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Intention]
  • August 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income Form 122C-2]
  • August 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • August 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • August 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor(s) Declaration Concerning Schedules]
  • August 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedules A-J]
  • August 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • August 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.