U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-05007
  • Case Name: Estate of Travis Michael Flores-Lee v. Anderson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • May 30, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Approve Agreement/Stipulation]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Change of Address (Debtor Only) (Text Entry)]
  • February 14, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 12, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Set Deadlines/Hearing]
  • February 09, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
  • February 09, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • February 06, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Approve Agreement (incls. an agreement, compromise, settlement or stipulation)]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Order Request]
  • January 11, 2018: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes (New)]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • September 11, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Return of Service ]
  • September 01, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Scheduling Order (pre-trial/trial)]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 30, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • August 25, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • August 25, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 25, 2017: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.