U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-04118
  • Case Name: Boen & Associates, Inc. v. HM LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Judgment]
  • January 16, 2018: [Dismiss]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Order for Discovery Report]
  • November 17, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 17, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Extend]
  • October 24, 2017: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 04, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 02, 2017: [Extend]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • August 28, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 28, 2017: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • August 28, 2017: [Complaint (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.