U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30090-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Crow et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 06, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 27, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 20, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 13, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 13, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 09, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 09, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • November 09, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
November, 2020
  • November 03, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 19, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 14, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 14, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 06, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 15, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 10, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 10, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 09, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 09, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 09, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 09, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 09, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 09, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 09, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 25, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 19, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 19, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 13, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 04, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 10, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 08, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 08, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 08, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 08, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 08, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • January 08, 2020: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • January 08, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 08, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 07, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 06, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 06, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 29, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2019
  • January 04, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 03, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 03, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 02, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 02, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • December 20, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 20, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 20, 2018: [Order]
  • December 20, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 20, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 20, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 20, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 20, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
March, 2018
  • March 09, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • February 05, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 05, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 05, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • February 05, 2018: [Sentencing]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 30, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 30, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 29, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 09, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 03, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 03, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 03, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Furlough]
  • December 27, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 22, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 22, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 22, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 22, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 19, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 07, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 29, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 16, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • November 15, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 03, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 02, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 02, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 02, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 01, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 31, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 24, 2017: [Order]
  • October 23, 2017: [Consent]
  • October 23, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 23, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order]
  • October 18, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 18, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 26, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 26, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 26, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • September 01, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 01, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 01, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 31, 2017: [Order]
  • August 31, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 30, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 30, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • August 30, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • August 30, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 30, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 30, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • August 30, 2017: [Request]
  • August 29, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • August 29, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 29, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 29, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 29, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 29, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 29, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 29, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 29, 2017: [Arrest]
  • August 29, 2017: [Request]
  • August 29, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 29, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 28, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 28, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 28, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 28, 2017: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.