U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:14-cr-30014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Thompson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 27, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 15, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • March 13, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 13, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 05, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 19, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 14, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 14, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 14, 2019: [Order]
  • February 14, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • February 14, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 14, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
January, 2019
  • January 18, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 16, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 16, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 16, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • January 14, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 14, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 11, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 11, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 05, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 05, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 27, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 21, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • October 23, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 19, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 19, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • October 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • October 03, 2017: [Furlough]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • September 27, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 30, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 30, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 30, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 30, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • August 30, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 30, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 30, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • August 29, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.