U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50133-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilford
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • September 22, 2022: [Response]
  • September 22, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • August 15, 2022: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Reduce Sentence]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Transcript]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Transcript]
  • October 01, 2021: [Transcript]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 04, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 04, 2021: [Sentencing]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 28, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 28, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 21, 2021: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Transcript]
  • February 17, 2021: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
January, 2021
  • January 26, 2021: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • January 26, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • January 26, 2021: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • January 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Transcript]
  • January 22, 2021: [Transcript]
  • January 07, 2021: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 06, 2021: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • January 04, 2021: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2020
  • December 29, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Supplement]
  • November 09, 2020: [Supplement]
  • November 09, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • November 04, 2020: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 23, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 13, 2020: [Extend]
  • October 02, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 07, 2020: [Consent]
  • August 06, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 06, 2020: [Consent]
  • August 06, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 05, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 05, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 04, 2020: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 13, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 13, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 13, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 08, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • May 19, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 19, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • May 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • May 19, 2020: [Withdraw Document]
  • May 14, 2020: [Extend]
  • May 05, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Extend]
  • April 27, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 16, 2020: [Extend]
  • April 10, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 09, 2020: [Leave to]
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
January, 2020
  • January 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 23, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 21, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • January 14, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • October 18, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Response]
  • September 17, 2019: [Transcript]
  • September 13, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • September 06, 2019: [Extend]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Oral Order]
  • August 28, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • August 28, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
July, 2019
  • July 17, 2019: [Reply]
  • July 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 05, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Extend]
  • June 21, 2019: [Extend]
  • June 10, 2019: [Notice]
  • June 07, 2019: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 07, 2019: [Extend]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 31, 2019: [Suppress]
  • May 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 08, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • April 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 04, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 27, 2019: [Request]
  • March 27, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 08, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 04, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 14, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • December 14, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 09, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 07, 2018: [Notice]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 05, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 14, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 17, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Consent]
  • June 26, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • June 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 21, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 15, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 17, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 08, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 02, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 16, 2018: [Extend]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 19, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Letter(s) of Support]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 20, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • September 01, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 01, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 01, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 01, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 01, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 01, 2017: [Arraignment]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • August 31, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 30, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 30, 2017: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.