U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smart
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
November, 2019
  • November 07, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 06, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2018
  • April 06, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 03, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 20, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 19, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • March 19, 2018: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • March 19, 2018: [Allocution Statement]
  • March 16, 2018: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • March 02, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 02, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 02, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 01, 2018: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 16, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 01, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 20, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 20, 2017: [Consent]
  • December 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 15, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • December 14, 2017: [Consent]
  • December 14, 2017: [Furlough]
  • December 14, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 14, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 14, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2017
  • November 06, 2017: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • November 01, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 31, 2017: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
  • October 31, 2017: [Revoke]
  • October 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 20, 2017: [Consent]
  • October 20, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 05, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order]
  • October 02, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 02, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: [Request]
  • September 11, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Order]
  • August 31, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 31, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 30, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 30, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 30, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 30, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 30, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • August 30, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 30, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • August 30, 2017: [Request]
  • August 30, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • August 30, 2017: [Arrest]
  • August 30, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 30, 2017: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.