U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:13-cr-50053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bores A Hole
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • July 22, 2019: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 21, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 03, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
September, 2017
  • September 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • September 18, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 13, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • September 05, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 01, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 01, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 01, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 01, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 01, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 31, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.