U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50125-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brings Plenty et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2019
  • February 08, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 08, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 08, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 05, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 05, 2019: [Consent]
  • February 05, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order]
  • February 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • February 01, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 01, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • January 28, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • January 25, 2019: [Order]
  • January 25, 2019: [Consent]
  • January 25, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 25, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • January 17, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 16, 2019: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 16, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 16, 2019: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 16, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 16, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Transcript]
  • November 14, 2018: [Extend]
  • November 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 01, 2018: [Consent]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Extend]
  • October 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 23, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • October 19, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • October 19, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 18, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Strike]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 07, 2018: [Reply]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Extend]
  • August 24, 2018: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • August 10, 2018: [Extend]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Extend]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • July 06, 2018: [Extend]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Joinder]
  • June 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 22, 2018: [Extend]
  • June 20, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 20, 2018: [Order Referring Motion]
  • June 15, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 15, 2018: [Bill of Particulars]
  • June 15, 2018: [Strike ]
May, 2018
  • May 04, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 04, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • April 24, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2018
  • March 01, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Consent]
  • February 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 21, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • January 12, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 08, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • December 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 19, 2017: [Consent]
  • December 13, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 06, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 11, 2017: [Consent]
  • October 06, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • September 13, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 13, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 13, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 13, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 13, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 13, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • September 12, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 12, 2017: [Arrest]
  • September 12, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 08, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • September 08, 2017: [Request]
  • September 08, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 06, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 06, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 06, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 06, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 06, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 06, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 06, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • September 05, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 05, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.