U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40080-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Graham
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 28, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 27, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 27, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • August 20, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 20, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 20, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 02, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 04, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 22, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 22, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 22, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 02, 2018: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 20, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 19, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 06, 2017: [Discovery]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Response]
  • September 27, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 27, 2017: [Request]
  • September 25, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 25, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 25, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 25, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 25, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 25, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 25, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • September 11, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 07, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • September 06, 2017: [Indictment]
  • September 06, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.