U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:10-cr-40067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sandstrom
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • July 23, 2019: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 25, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 20, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 15, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 12, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 12, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 12, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 12, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • September 07, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 07, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 07, 2017: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 07, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 07, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 07, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • September 06, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.