U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40078-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mast
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • June 07, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • June 07, 2021: [USCA Opinion]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • July 22, 2020: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • July 21, 2020: [Transcript - Public]
  • July 21, 2020: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • July 21, 2020: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 07, 2020: [Judgment - Amended]
  • July 06, 2020: [Sentencing]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 21, 2020: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Trial Brief ]
  • March 12, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 09, 2020: [Trial Brief ]
February, 2020
  • February 19, 2020: [Trial Brief ]
  • February 12, 2020: [Transcript]
  • February 05, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • February 05, 2020: [Court Trial Held (One Day Trial)]
  • February 03, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 28, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 28, 2020: [In Limine]
  • January 28, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 28, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • January 28, 2020: [Notice]
  • January 27, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 27, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 22, 2020: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • January 21, 2020: [Letter]
  • January 17, 2020: [Affidavit in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 17, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • January 10, 2020: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • January 10, 2020: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 10, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 10, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 10, 2020: [Notice]
  • January 10, 2020: [Appeal Record Returned]
December, 2019
  • December 10, 2019: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 10, 2019: [Status Conference]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 08, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 08, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • October 10, 2019: [USCA Order]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • September 16, 2019: [USCA Opinion]
April, 2019
  • April 10, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • June 28, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • June 28, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • June 28, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • June 27, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 27, 2018: [Transcript]
  • June 26, 2018: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
  • June 14, 2018: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
  • June 06, 2018: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
May, 2018
  • May 17, 2018: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
  • May 15, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • May 14, 2018: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • May 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • April 24, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • April 20, 2018: [Court Reporter Information]
  • April 20, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • April 20, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 20, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 20, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • April 09, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 09, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • April 09, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • April 05, 2018: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • April 02, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 02, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 02, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 19, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 05, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2018
  • January 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 19, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • January 19, 2018: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • January 19, 2018: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • January 19, 2018: [Verdict]
  • January 19, 2018: [Response to Jury Question]
  • January 19, 2018: [Jury Question]
  • January 19, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • January 18, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • January 18, 2018: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • January 18, 2018: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • January 17, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 17, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • January 17, 2018: [Jury List]
  • January 16, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 15, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • January 14, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • January 13, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • January 12, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 12, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 12, 2018: [In Limine]
  • January 10, 2018: [Notice]
  • January 10, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 10, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 10, 2018: [In Limine]
  • January 10, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 09, 2018: [In Limine]
  • January 09, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 08, 2018: [Notice]
  • January 04, 2018: [Notice]
  • January 03, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 21, 2017: [Notice]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 02, 2017: [Request]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 25, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 25, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 25, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 25, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • September 11, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 07, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • September 06, 2017: [Indictment]
  • September 06, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.