U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40079-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez-Quintana et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 18, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2019
  • August 12, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: [Notice]
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Passport - Return of]
  • March 26, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 26, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 25, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • March 18, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 18, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 18, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 04, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 11, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 10, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 10, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 04, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 04, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 04, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 04, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 30, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 30, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 30, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • October 16, 2018: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 15, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 27, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • August 24, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 21, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 17, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 21, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 17, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • November 30, 2017: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 30, 2017: [Joinder]
  • November 29, 2017: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 20, 2017: [Discovery]
  • September 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 18, 2017: [Response]
  • September 18, 2017: [Discovery]
  • September 15, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • September 15, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • September 14, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 14, 2017: [Request]
  • September 14, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 13, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 13, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 13, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 13, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 13, 2017: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • September 13, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • September 08, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 08, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 07, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 07, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 06, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 06, 2017: [Interpreter Needed]
  • September 06, 2017: [Indictment]
  • September 06, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • September 06, 2017: [Complaint]
  • September 06, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.