U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50131-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hopkins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • September 29, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 11, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 08, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • March 08, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • March 08, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • February 26, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 25, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 21, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 20, 2019: [Certificate]
  • February 19, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 19, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 19, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 19, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 15, 2019: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
January, 2019
  • January 11, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 09, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 19, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 19, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 12, 2018: [Consent]
  • October 12, 2018: [Status Conference]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 21, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 21, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 21, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • August 17, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 14, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 13, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • August 13, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 13, 2018: [Memorandum Letter]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 05, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2018
  • March 27, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 21, 2018: [Consent]
  • March 21, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 14, 2018: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
February, 2018
  • February 02, 2018: [Response]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 26, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 26, 2018: [In Limine]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 21, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 10, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 03, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 03, 2017: [Request]
  • October 03, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 02, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 29, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 29, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 29, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 29, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 29, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 28, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • September 25, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • September 13, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • September 07, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 07, 2017: [Arrest - Other District]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.