U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40085-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McKay
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • December 03, 2020: [Reply to Motion Response]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Response]
  • November 24, 2020: [Order]
  • November 24, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 23, 2020: [Extend]
  • November 06, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 06, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 05, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • October 19, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 27, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 27, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • August 27, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 20, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 20, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 20, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • August 20, 2018: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 20, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 20, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 20, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 13, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 13, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 13, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 06, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 01, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 01, 2018: [Letter(s) of Support]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 31, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 28, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 24, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • July 18, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 04, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 25, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 23, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 23, 2018: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • May 23, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 23, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 23, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 22, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 21, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 21, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Consent]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 07, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • January 25, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • January 24, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 24, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 24, 2018: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • January 23, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 23, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • January 19, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 19, 2018: [Hearing]
December, 2017
  • December 12, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 11, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 16, 2017: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 16, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • November 15, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 15, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Discovery]
  • October 31, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 18, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 18, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 18, 2017: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • October 18, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • October 18, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 18, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 18, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 13, 2017: [Discovery]
  • October 13, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • October 12, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 12, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 12, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 11, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • October 11, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 11, 2017: [Indictment - Superseding]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 26, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 26, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 20, 2017: [Discovery]
  • September 18, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 18, 2017: [Response]
  • September 14, 2017: [Request]
  • September 14, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 14, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 13, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 13, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 13, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 13, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 13, 2017: [Arrest]
  • September 13, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • September 13, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 07, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 07, 2017: [Indictment]
  • September 07, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.