U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moulton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
May, 2018
  • May 10, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 10, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 09, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • May 04, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 03, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 03, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 03, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 02, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • April 17, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 06, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 15, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 15, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 07, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 07, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 07, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 07, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 02, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 23, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 02, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 19, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 15, 2017: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 02, 2017: [Discovery]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Response]
  • September 27, 2017: [Request]
  • September 27, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 25, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 25, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 25, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 25, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 25, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 25, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 25, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • September 11, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 07, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • September 07, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 07, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • September 07, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.