U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40083-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez-Rivas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 13, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 13, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 13, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • November 02, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 17, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 17, 2017: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • October 12, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • September 07, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • September 07, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 07, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.