U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40082-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Haggard et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • May 09, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • May 07, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 07, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 07, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 07, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 03, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 11, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 08, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • March 07, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • March 07, 2019: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • March 07, 2019: [Verdict]
  • March 07, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 07, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • March 07, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • March 06, 2019: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • March 06, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • March 06, 2019: [Jury List]
  • March 05, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 05, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • March 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • March 01, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • March 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 01, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 27, 2019: [Exclude]
  • February 27, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions (Redacted)]
  • February 27, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • February 27, 2019: [In Limine]
  • February 27, 2019: [Notice]
  • February 27, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 27, 2019: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 27, 2019: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 27, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 26, 2019: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
  • February 20, 2019: [Bill of Particulars]
  • February 20, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • February 20, 2019: [Sever Defendant]
  • February 20, 2019: [Notice]
  • February 13, 2019: [Notice]
  • February 04, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • January 31, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 30, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 26, 2018: [Request]
  • December 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • December 21, 2018: [Discovery]
  • December 20, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 19, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 19, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 19, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • December 18, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 18, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 20, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • November 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 19, 2018: [Arrest]
  • November 19, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • November 16, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 16, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • November 15, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 09, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • November 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 09, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 02, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 10, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • October 10, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • October 10, 2018: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • October 10, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • October 10, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 10, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 09, 2018: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 09, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • October 05, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 03, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • September 17, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • September 04, 2018: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • September 04, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 04, 2018: [Arrest - Other District]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 29, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 20, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 17, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Discovery]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 24, 2018: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 21, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 21, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 18, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 08, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 08, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • May 08, 2018: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
March, 2018
  • March 15, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 13, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Discovery]
  • February 26, 2018: [Response]
  • February 22, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 21, 2018: [Request]
  • February 21, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • February 20, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 20, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • February 20, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 20, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 20, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • February 20, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 20, 2018: [Arrest]
  • February 20, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • February 20, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2017
  • September 07, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 07, 2017: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • September 07, 2017: [Indictment]
  • September 07, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.