U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-40426
  • Case Name: Brandy Leigh Forshey
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Closing Case]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Vacating Order]
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Amend Order (No Notice Required)]
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Discharging Debtor(s)]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • November 23, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Turnover of Property from Debtor]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Objection to Debtor(s) Claim of Exemptions]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 15, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 15, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • November 10, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Turnover of Property from Debtor]
  • November 10, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Objection to Debtor(s) Claim of Exemptions]
  • November 09, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employment of Attorney]
  • November 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Abandonment, Compel Trustee and Relief from Automatic Stay]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • October 18, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Abandonment, Compel and Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • October 16, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • October 16, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Change of Address (Debtor Only) (Text Entry)]
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Add Trustee]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employee Income Records]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.