U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-10030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ortley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 02, 2025: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 11, 2025: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 07, 2025: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 07, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • April 02, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2018
  • October 02, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 02, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 02, 2018: [Sentencing]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 07, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 07, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 22, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 21, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 20, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 16, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 16, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 15, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 10, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 01, 2018: [Continue]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 26, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 26, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 25, 2018: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 20, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 06, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • June 06, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 06, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 06, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2018
  • May 14, 2018: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • April 26, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 06, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • April 05, 2018: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • April 05, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • April 05, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
January, 2018
  • January 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 05, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 05, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 21, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 21, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Order]
  • October 16, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • October 05, 2017: [Order]
  • October 05, 2017: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • October 04, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 28, 2017: [Response]
  • September 28, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 28, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 28, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 27, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 27, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 27, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 27, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • September 25, 2017: [Request]
  • September 25, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 21, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 15, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 12, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.