U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-10031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cameron
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
September, 2020
  • September 03, 2020: [Response to Motion]
August, 2020
  • August 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 19, 2020: [Extend]
  • August 14, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • August 13, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 19, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 16, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 16, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • July 09, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 09, 2018: [Extend]
  • July 06, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 06, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 06, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 20, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 18, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 08, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 26, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 26, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 26, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 26, 2018: [Consent]
  • April 24, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 23, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • April 14, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 12, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 12, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 12, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 09, 2018: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 03, 2018: [Extend]
January, 2018
  • January 03, 2018: [Court Reporter Information]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 26, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 26, 2017: [Suppress]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Order]
  • October 20, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • October 20, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • October 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 13, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 13, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 29, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 28, 2017: [Response]
  • September 28, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 28, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 28, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 28, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 28, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 28, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 27, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • September 27, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • September 27, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • September 27, 2017: [Request]
  • September 27, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 21, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 15, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 12, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.