U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30131-1
  • Case Name: USA v. White Feather
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 14, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 04, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 27, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 13, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 03, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 13, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order]
  • November 13, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • November 13, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 31, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • October 26, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 26, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 26, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 20, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 20, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 20, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • August 20, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 15, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 15, 2018: [Proposed Order]
  • August 15, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 08, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 08, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 08, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 11, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 08, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Same Day Plea and Sentencing]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Same Day Plea and Sentencing]
  • May 21, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 21, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 21, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2018
  • April 09, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
January, 2018
  • January 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • December 20, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • December 19, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
November, 2017
  • November 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 03, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [Order]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • September 25, 2017: [Order]
  • September 25, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 25, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • September 22, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 20, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 20, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • September 20, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 20, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 20, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 19, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 19, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 19, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 19, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 19, 2017: [Arrest]
  • September 18, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 18, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 18, 2017: [Request]
  • September 18, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 18, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • September 15, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 15, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2017: [Indictment]
  • September 13, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 13, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.