U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30132-1
  • Case Name: USA v. White Feather
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2018
  • January 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • January 03, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • January 02, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 17, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • October 17, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 13, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 04, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order]
  • September 27, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • September 27, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 26, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 26, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 26, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 26, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 26, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 26, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 26, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 26, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 26, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • September 25, 2017: [Request]
  • September 25, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 22, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 22, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 13, 2017: [Request]
  • September 13, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 13, 2017: [Indictment]
  • September 13, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.