U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30130-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Abernathy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 28, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 27, 2022: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 16, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 07, 2022: [Text Order]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 03, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 01, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • June 01, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 01, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 27, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 27, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 20, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 20, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 28, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 28, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing (FOR COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 28, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • July 28, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 28, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 22, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 21, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 21, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 21, 2021: [Oral Motion to Continue Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 21, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Continue Detention Hearing]
  • July 21, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 20, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • July 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 15, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • July 14, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 14, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 14, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 12, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
January, 2021
  • January 19, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 15, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 23, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 23, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 23, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • July 11, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 11, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 11, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 10, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 09, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 03, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 03, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 14, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 13, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2018
  • May 04, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 03, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 01, 2018: [Status Conference]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 17, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 17, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 17, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 17, 2018: [Notice]
February, 2018
  • February 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 15, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 15, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 09, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 09, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 09, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 26, 2017: [Request]
  • September 25, 2017: [Order]
  • September 25, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 19, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 19, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • September 19, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 19, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • September 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 18, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 18, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 18, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 18, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 18, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 18, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • September 18, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 18, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 18, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 18, 2017: [Arrest]
  • September 18, 2017: [Request]
  • September 15, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 15, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 13, 2017: [Indictment]
  • September 13, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.