U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30129-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rabbitt
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 05, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 05, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 21, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 21, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 07, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • July 29, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 29, 2021: [Text Order of Detention]
  • July 29, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 03, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 03, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 03, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 03, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 03, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 21, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 21, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • February 21, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • February 21, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 15, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • February 14, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 14, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 14, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 01, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 17, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 01, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 28, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 28, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 28, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 28, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 16, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order]
  • October 06, 2017: [Stipulation]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 27, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 27, 2017: [Request]
  • September 27, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 26, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 26, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 26, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 26, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 26, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 26, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 26, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 26, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 26, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • September 22, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 22, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 13, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 13, 2017: [Indictment]
  • September 13, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.