U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50142-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wilson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Letter]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [Letter]
  • March 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Relief under FIRST STEP Act]
  • March 11, 2021: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Order re Exhibits]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 12, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 12, 2020: [Response]
  • November 04, 2020: [Supplement]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Response]
  • September 28, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 15, 2020: [Extend]
  • September 09, 2020: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • September 09, 2020: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 25, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 28, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 21, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • November 21, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • November 19, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 14, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 13, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • November 13, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 13, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2018: [Extend]
October, 2018
  • October 05, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 04, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 20, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 03, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 03, 2018: [Consent]
  • August 03, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 20, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 20, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 20, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2018
  • June 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 12, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
May, 2018
  • May 16, 2018: [Furlough]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • April 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 27, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • April 27, 2018: [Furlough]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 11, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 04, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 07, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 02, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [Order]
  • February 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 05, 2018: [Furlough]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • January 16, 2018: [Furlough]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 11, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 08, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 16, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 06, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 15, 2017: [Request]
  • September 15, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 15, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • September 13, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 13, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 13, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 13, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 13, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 13, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 13, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • September 13, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 13, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.