U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30127-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Patterson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 11, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 11, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • June 11, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 30, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 30, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 24, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 16, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 07, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 02, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • March 27, 2018: [Furlough]
  • March 23, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 21, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 20, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 20, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 20, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 20, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Competency Report]
  • February 01, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Competency Evaluation]
  • December 11, 2017: [Competency Evaluation]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 15, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 15, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Order]
  • October 13, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • October 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 10, 2017: [Request]
  • October 10, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 05, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 05, 2017: [Request]
  • October 05, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 05, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 05, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 04, 2017: [Consent]
  • October 04, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 04, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 04, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 04, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • October 04, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 04, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 04, 2017: [Arrest]
  • October 03, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 13, 2017: [Indictment]
  • September 13, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.