U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30126-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hood
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 29, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 29, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • October 16, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 16, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 16, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 16, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 12, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 11, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 10, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 02, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Objection]
  • August 30, 2018: [Furlough]
  • August 27, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 02, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 02, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 01, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • August 01, 2018: [Notice]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 26, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • July 26, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • July 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 10, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • July 10, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 10, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 10, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 25, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 04, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 03, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 22, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 22, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 22, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 22, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 08, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 08, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2017
  • November 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 01, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 01, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 05, 2017: [Order]
  • October 04, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 02, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 02, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • October 02, 2017: [Bail Report]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 27, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 27, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 27, 2017: [Request]
  • September 27, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 26, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 26, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 26, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 26, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 26, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 26, 2017: [Arrest]
  • September 26, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 26, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • September 13, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 13, 2017: [Indictment]
  • September 13, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.