U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30125-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • February 09, 2018: [Judgment - Amended]
  • February 08, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 08, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 08, 2018: [Sentencing]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 26, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 26, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 03, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 15, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 09, 2017: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • September 27, 2017: [Request]
  • September 27, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 27, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 27, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 26, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 26, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 26, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 26, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 26, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 26, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 26, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 26, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 25, 2017: [Arrest]
  • September 25, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • September 25, 2017: [Request]
  • September 25, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 22, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 22, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 13, 2017: [Indictment]
  • September 13, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.