U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50144-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Faulkner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
  • June 21, 2022: [Mail Returned]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Transcript]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Transcript]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • October 28, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • October 28, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • October 24, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 21, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 21, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 21, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 01, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 05, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 26, 2019: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • August 05, 2019: [Compel ]
July, 2019
  • July 03, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 01, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 01, 2019: [Consent]
  • July 01, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 01, 2019: [Amended Plea Agreement]
  • July 01, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • June 21, 2019: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 21, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 21, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 21, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 13, 2019: [Notice]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 05, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • June 04, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • May 16, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
February, 2019
  • February 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 20, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 20, 2019: [Continue]
  • February 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • January 24, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • January 23, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • January 23, 2019: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • January 09, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
  • January 02, 2019: [Seal Existing Document]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 02, 2019: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • December 21, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 21, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • December 19, 2018: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • December 06, 2018: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • December 03, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • December 03, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Response]
  • September 21, 2018: [Extend]
  • September 13, 2018: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Extend]
  • July 25, 2018: [Response]
  • July 19, 2018: [Supplement]
  • July 12, 2018: [Extend]
  • July 03, 2018: [Extend]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 21, 2018: [Transcript]
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • May 01, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • May 01, 2018: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • May 01, 2018: [Subpoena Returned Executed (EX PARTE)]
April, 2018
  • April 18, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 18, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2018: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • April 16, 2018: [Subpoena Issued]
  • April 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Subpoena(s)]
  • April 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 05, 2018: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 05, 2018: [Subpoena(s)]
March, 2018
  • March 01, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 20, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • February 20, 2018: [Extend]
  • February 07, 2018: [Extend]
  • February 05, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 31, 2018: [Extend]
  • January 30, 2018: [Suppress]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 08, 2018: [For Order]
  • January 05, 2018: [Extend]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 13, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 02, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 13, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 13, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 13, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 13, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 13, 2017: [Unseal Case]
  • September 13, 2017: [Text Order]
  • September 13, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 13, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.