U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50143-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bradshaw
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Order for Disposition of Exhibits]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 21, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 15, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 15, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • May 08, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 08, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 08, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 20, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 16, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • February 20, 2018: [Extend]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 05, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 05, 2018: [Consent]
  • January 05, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
December, 2017
  • December 22, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 21, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 21, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 21, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 21, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2017
  • November 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 24, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 13, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 13, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 13, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • September 13, 2017: [Unseal Case]
  • September 13, 2017: [Text Order]
  • September 13, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • September 13, 2017: [Indictment]
  • September 12, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.