U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40087-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Merriweather
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • September 09, 2021: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: [Letter]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Allocution Statement]
  • September 17, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • September 11, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 11, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 10, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • September 04, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 04, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 01, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 01, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 31, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 20, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 22, 2018: [Continue]
  • June 11, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 04, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 04, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 01, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 01, 2018: [Arrest - Other District]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 25, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 12, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 12, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 12, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 13, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 13, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 08, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 07, 2017: [Continue]
October, 2017
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 04, 2017: [Discovery]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Response]
  • September 19, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 19, 2017: [Request]
  • September 19, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 18, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 18, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 18, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 18, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 18, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 18, 2017: [Arrest]
  • September 18, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • September 14, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 14, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 14, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.