U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40086-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dones-Vargas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Response]
  • December 09, 2022: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • November 21, 2022: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2019
  • November 14, 2019: [Appeal Record Returned]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 22, 2019: [USCA Order]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • August 21, 2019: [USCA Opinion]
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • September 07, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • September 06, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • September 06, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • September 06, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • September 06, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 06, 2018: [Transcript]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
  • August 01, 2018: [Mail Returned]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [USCA Order]
  • July 30, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • July 26, 2018: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • July 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 26, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • July 26, 2018: [Court Reporter Information]
  • July 26, 2018: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 26, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • July 20, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Executed]
  • July 17, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 17, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 16, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • July 16, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 14, 2018: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • July 11, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • July 11, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • July 11, 2018: [Proposed Order]
  • July 11, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • July 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 09, 2018: [Continue]
  • July 06, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Existing Document]
  • July 06, 2018: [Seal Existing Document]
  • July 05, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 05, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • June 25, 2018: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • June 25, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 23, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • June 23, 2018: [Transcript]
  • June 13, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 08, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 07, 2018: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • June 07, 2018: [New Trial]
  • June 07, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 06, 2018: [Continue]
  • June 06, 2018: [New Trial]
  • June 04, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 04, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 04, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • May 22, 2018: [Leave to]
  • May 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 04, 2018: [Extend]
  • May 04, 2018: [Continue]
April, 2018
  • April 02, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 29, 2018: [Continue]
  • March 19, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 30, 2018: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • January 30, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • January 30, 2018: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • January 30, 2018: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • January 30, 2018: [Verdict]
  • January 30, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • January 30, 2018: [Jury Question]
  • January 29, 2018: [Jury List]
  • January 29, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • January 29, 2018: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • January 28, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • January 28, 2018: [Witness List]
  • January 26, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 26, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 26, 2018: [In Limine]
  • January 26, 2018: [Witness List]
  • January 26, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • January 22, 2018: [In Limine]
  • January 17, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 17, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 16, 2018: [In Limine]
  • January 16, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 16, 2018: [Notice]
  • January 16, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • January 10, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 10, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 10, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • January 10, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 10, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • January 09, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • January 09, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • January 09, 2018: [Interpreter Needed]
  • January 09, 2018: [Hearing]
  • January 08, 2018: [In Limine]
  • January 08, 2018: [Notice]
  • January 08, 2018: [Discovery]
  • January 04, 2018: [Response to Motion]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: [Discovery]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • November 20, 2017: [Discovery]
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 07, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 07, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 01, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 28, 2017: [Discovery]
  • September 19, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 18, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 18, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 18, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 18, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • September 15, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 14, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 14, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 14, 2017: [Consent]
  • September 14, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 14, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • September 14, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 14, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 14, 2017: [Arrest]
  • September 14, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.