U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-50206
  • Case Name: Eddie Eugene Bissonette
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • July 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
May, 2018
  • May 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Affidavit of Default]
March, 2018
  • March 25, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • March 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • March 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 08, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing]
  • March 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
  • March 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • February 16, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges]
  • February 09, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Late Notice]
  • February 07, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Filing Proof of Claim]
  • February 06, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 29, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • December 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • November 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
October, 2017
  • October 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • September 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • September 16, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.