U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-04127
  • Case Name: Gonsalez-Campos v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Judgment]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • October 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 18, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • June 21, 2018: [Notice]
  • June 12, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Response]
  • April 16, 2018: [Letter Received]
  • April 03, 2018: [Text Order]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Letter Received]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 02, 2018: [Response]
  • January 02, 2018: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • January 02, 2018: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Ex Parte Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 18, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 18, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • December 18, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Certificate]
  • November 17, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • November 01, 2017: [Certificate]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Notice]
  • October 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 24, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 23, 2017: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 23, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 17, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines]
  • October 13, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 13, 2017: [Extend Deadlines]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 18, 2017: [Order]
  • September 15, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • September 15, 2017: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (28:2255) (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.