U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:96-cr-40084-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Cordell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 22, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Order]
  • November 30, 2017: [Proposed Order]
October, 2017
  • October 05, 2017: [Answer of Garnishee]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 18, 2017: [Clerk's Notice of Post-Judgment Garnishment]
  • September 18, 2017: [Writ of Continuing Garnishment Issued]
  • September 18, 2017: [Application for Writ of Continuing Garnishment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.